Beskrone v. Engie Insight Services Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-10585
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-10585
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | J Kate Stickles |
Case #: | 1:25-ap-50698 |
Nature of Suit | 498 null 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | May 01, 2025 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Engie Insight Services Inc.
3800 North Central Avenue Suite 460
Phoenix, AZ 85012 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Don A. Beskrone, Chapter 7 Trustee For JC USA, Inc., et al.
Ashby & Geddes, P.A. 500 Delaware Avenue 8th Floor
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Tuesday, May 06, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Engie Insight Services Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 7/29/2025 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Keenan, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Thursday, May 01, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Thu 05/01 3:23 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 25-50698 JKS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number Deferred, amount $ 350.00. (Hollis) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 25-50698 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by Don A. Beskrone, Chapter 7 Trustee for JC USA, Inc., et al. against Engie Insight Services Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)). AP Summons Served due date: 7/30/2025. (Keenan, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |