Beskrone v. Post-Benson Corporation
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-10585
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-10585
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | J Kate Stickles |
Case #: | 1:25-ap-50779 |
Nature of Suit | 498 null 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | May 02, 2025 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Post-Benson Corporation
911 Post Road
Fairfield, CT 06824 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Don A. Beskrone, Chapter 7 Trustee for JC USA, Inc., et al.
Ashby & Geddes, P.A. 500 Delaware Avenue 8th Floor
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 08, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Post-Benson Corporation. Pretrial Conference set for 7/29/2025 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Keenan, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Monday, May 05, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Mon 05/05 8:36 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 25-50779 JKS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number Deferred, amount $ 350.00. (Hollis) |
|
Friday, May 02, 2025 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 25-50779 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by Don A. Beskrone, Chapter 7 Trustee for JC USA, Inc., et al. against Post-Benson Corporation. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)). AP Summons Served due date: 7/31/2025. (Keenan, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |