Arizona District Court
Judge:Michael T Liburdi
Case #: 2:25-cv-01481
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:May 01, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 11:07 AM MST
Defendant
Hatten Holdings Incorporated
Plaintiff
Chet Michael Wilson
Represented By
Anthony Paronich
Paronich Law PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM MST
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
6 6 service Service Executed Wed 05/07 12:57 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Chet Michael Wilson: Affidavit of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon HATTEN HOLDINGS, INC. on 5/6/2025. (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Mon 05/05 7:34 AM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Anthony Paronich on behalf of Plaintiff Chet Michael Wilson. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 05/02 8:50 AM
Summons Issued as to Hatten Holdings Incorporated. (REK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
5 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required . This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc New Case Opened Fri 05/02 8:48 AM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-24248468. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Liburdi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 25-01481 PHX-MTL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Submitted Fri 05/02 8:48 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by Chet Michael Wilson. (submitted by Anthony Paronich) (REK)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 05/02 8:47 AM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-24248468 filed by Chet Michael Wilson. (submitted by Anthony Paronich)(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Fri 05/02 8:50 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required . This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
Related: [-]