Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Sheri Polster Chappell
Referred: Nicholas P Mizell
Case #: 2:25-cv-00364
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:May 02, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 2:07 PM EDT
Defendant
A&E Construction of Florida, Inc.
8250 Promoso Court
Naples, FL 34114
Defendant
Afif Eljizi
8250 Promoso Court
Naples, FL 34114
Plaintiff
Autotech Engineering R&D USA Inc.
Burr & Forman 200 E. Broward Blvd. Suite 1020
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301
Represented By
Andrew Todd Sarangoulis
Burr & Forman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Andrew T Sarangoulis
Burr & Forman, LLP 200 E. Broward Blvd. Suite 1020
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
8 8 order Civil Action Order Mon 05/05 1:36 PM
CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/5/2025. (WRW)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons issued Mon 05/05 10:11 AM
SUMMONS issued as to A&E Construction of Florida, Inc., Afif Eljizi. (BD)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 05/02 4:30 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Andrew Todd Sarangoulis of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MLB)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Proposed summons Fri 05/02 12:41 PM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Autotech Engineering R&D USA Inc.. (Sarangoulis, Andrew)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Proposed summons Fri 05/02 12:37 PM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Autotech Engineering R&D USA Inc.. (Sarangoulis, Andrew)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Proposed summons Fri 05/02 12:36 PM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Autotech Engineering R&D USA Inc.. (Sarangoulis, Andrew)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 05/02 11:58 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:25-cv-364-SPC-NPM. (RPB)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 05/02 11:55 AM
COMPLAINT against Afif Eljizi and A&E Construction of Florida, Inc. filed by Autotech Engineering R&D USA, Inc. (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-23315570).(Sarangoulis, Andrew) Modified on 5/2/2025 to edit the docket text (MLB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet