Maryland District Court
Judge:Deborah L Boardman
Case #: 8:25-cv-01411
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement (definitions)
Case Filed:May 02, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 2:08 PM EDT
Defendant
JOHN DOE
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Christian Wood Waugh, I
Waugh PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
4 4 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 05/09 1:57 PM
MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC(Waugh, Christian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jorge Arco,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Patrick Paige,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer,
Att: 4 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, May 05, 2025
3 3 corresp Miscellaneous Mon 05/05 2:25 PM
Correspondence from Clerk re: Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (c/m 5/5/2025 heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
2 2 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Fri 05/02 1:43 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Waugh, Christian)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 05/02 1:36 PM
COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against JOHN DOE ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11950049.), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Waugh, Christian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Infringement Log