New Jersey District Court
Judge:Julien Xavier Neals
Referred: Andre M Espinosa
Case #: 2:25-cv-03768
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:May 02, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 2:10 PM EDT
Defendant
CREATIVE FURNITURE GALLERIES, INC.
Plaintiff
NORBERTO VEGA
Represented By
RAMI SALIM
Stein Saks PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 05/05 10:19 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to CREATIVE FURNITURE GALLERIES, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (adc, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Mon 05/05 10:02 AM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (kd)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Fillable PDF Mon 05/05 10:17 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE -1 -1 Civil Cover Sheet filed by RAMI SALIM on 5/2/2025 was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our[LINK:website] under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your document has been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (adc) Modified on 5/5/2025 (adc)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 03, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Sat 05/03 11:08 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Julien Xavier Neals and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. (mfr)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 05/02 1:59 PM
COMPLAINT against CREATIVE FURNITURE GALLERIES, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-16224523) with JURY DEMAND, filed by NORBERTO VEGA.(SALIM, RAMI)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet