Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Bridget Meehan Brennan
Case #: 1:25-cv-00882
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:May 02, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 2:08 PM EDT
Defendant
NewRez, LLC
312 Walnut Street Suite 1800
Cincinnati, OH 45202
Plaintiff
John R. Burks
Represented By
Marc E. Dann
Dannlaw
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
4 4 service Return of Service Executed Thu 05/08 10:11 AM
Return of Service by personal service executed upon NewRez, LLC on 5/7/2025, filed on behalf of John R. Burks Related document(s)1 ,2 ,3 . (Dann, Marc)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
3 3 order Initial Order - Judge Brennan Mon 05/05 11:50 AM
Initial Standing Order . Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 5/5/25. (T,A)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
2 2 oth_evt Summons Issued Fri 05/02 2:16 PM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon NewRez, LLC. (B,Ch)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 05/02 12:35 PM
Complaint for Damages with jury demand against Newrez, LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. Filing fee paid $ 405.00, Receipt number AOHNDC-13079776. Filed by John R. Burks. (Dann, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Loan Documents,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Partial Payment History,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Email Communications,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Denial Letter,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - 2023 Modification,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - CFPB Complaints,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 8 Proposed Summons on Newrez
utility Add and Terminate Judge Fri 05/02 2:07 PM
Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan assigned to case. (B,Ch)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Fri 05/02 2:08 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (B,Ch)
Related: [-]