Connecticut District Court
Judge:Michael P Shea
Case #: 3:25-cv-00712
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Case Filed:May 02, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance - Commissioner Wed 05/07 12:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Sertial appearing for Commissioner of Social Security, bar number 09982. (Paperless filing) (Sertial, Heather)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
6 6 notice SSA Cases - Notice of New Action Mon 05/05 11:57 AM
Notice of New SSA Action: Electronic service of the complaint was made by the Clerk's Office upon the Social Security Office of General Counsel and the US Attorney's Office for the District of Connecticut. (Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
5 5 intord SSA Cases - Notice to Counsel Mon 05/05 11:51 AM
Notice to Counsel: Due to privacy restrictions on social security cases, absent both a consent to electronic notice and an approved motion for efiling privileges, counsel must mail paper copies to self-represented litigants. Signed by Clerk on 5/2/2025.(Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Electronic Filing Order Mon 05/05 11:49 AM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 5/2/2025.(Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
3 3 intord SSA Cases - Standing Order Mon 05/05 11:48 AM
Standing Order re: Social Security Cases. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 5/2/2025.(Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
2 2 intord SSA Cases - Standing Order re: Assignment Mon 05/05 11:47 AM
Standing Order regarding Assignment of Appeals of Social Security Administration Decisions. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 5/2/2025.(Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/02 2:59 PM
COMPLAINT against Leland Dudek( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-8156100.), filed by Charles Cortese.(Yelner, Olia) Modified on 5/2/2025 to correct parties filed against(Hushin, Z.)
Related: [-]
utility NEW Case Assignment Fri 05/02 4:29 PM
CASE ASSIGNMENT: District Judge Michael P Shea assigned to the case. If the District Judge issues an Order of Referral to a Magistrate Judge for any matter other than settlement, the matter will be referred to Magistrate Judge Maria E. Garcia. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Mon 05/05 11:52 AM
Answer deadline updated for Leland Dudek to 7/2/2025. (Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]