Delaware District Court
Judge:Jennifer L Hall
Case #: 1:25-cv-00541
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:May 02, 2025
Case in other court:DE Court of Common Pleas, CPU4-25-002022
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 3:07 PM EDT
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Defendant
Trans Union, LLC
Represented By
Blake A. Bennett
Cooch And Taylor
contact info
Plaintiff
Priscilla Borges
112 Miners Lane
Newark, DE 19713


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
15 15 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Fri 05/09 3:39 PM
Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint to May 23, 2025 - filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Wilson, Tyler)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Notice of Removal Fri 05/09 1:14 PM
NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. re1 Notice of Removal Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4683089.(Wilson, Tyler) Modified docket text on 5/9/2025 - filing fee to be voided and refunded (ceg)
Related: [-]
13 13 12 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Fri 05/09 12:56 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Trans Union, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/23/2025.(Bennett, Blake)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
12 12 motion Dismiss/Fail to State Claim Fri 05/09 12:54 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Trans Union, LLC.(Bennett, Blake)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
11 11 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Fri 05/09 12:46 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange, LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services, LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Wilson, Tyler)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/09 12:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler Robert Wilson on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Wilson, Tyler)
Related: [-]
9 9 order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Fri 05/09 9:30 AM
SO ORDERED, re4 Stipulation and Order for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal. (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 5/19/2025). Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 5/9/2025. ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff on 5/9/2025*** (ceg)
Related: [-]
utility - CORRECTING ENTRY Fri 05/09 3:01 PM
CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket text for D.I.14 has been modified to reflect that the document is a "Consent to Notice of Removal" not a "Notice of Removal". The Filing Fee $405, receipt number ADEDC-4683089 will be voided and refunded by the Court's Finance Department. D.I. 15 has been removed from the docket as it was a duplicate filing of the Notice found at D.I.14 . (ceg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
8 8 notice Notice - Other Thu 05/08 3:44 PM
NOTICE of Equifax Information Services, LLC's Notice of Consent to Removal of Action by Equifax Information Services, LLC re1 Notice of Removal, (Grivner, Karen)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Thu 05/08 10:13 AM
SO ORDERED, re6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Connor L. Trapp filed by Trans Union, LLC. Ordered by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 5/8/2025. ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff on 5/8/2025*** (ceg)
Related: [-]
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Thu 05/08 3:10 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Connor L. Trapp for Trans Union, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (cdd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
7 7 misc -District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment Wed 05/07 4:35 PM
Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Connor L. Trapp. ( re6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Connor L. Trapp )( Payment of $ 50, receipt number ADEDC-4681395).(Bennett, Blake)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/07 4:32 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Connor L. Trapp - filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Bennett, Blake)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Wed 05/07 11:26 AM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Equifax, Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Grivner, Karen)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 05/07 11:17 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal, - filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Grivner, Karen)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 05/07 9:31 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Jennifer L. Hall. Please include the initials of the Judge (JLH) after the case number on all documents filed. (alb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Fri 05/02 2:58 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Transunion LLC, Other Affiliate TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Bennett, Blake)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Fri 05/02 2:20 PM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jfm)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 05/02 2:20 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Court of Common Pleas, Case Number CPU4-25-002022 (Filing fee $405, receipt number ADEDC-4677192)- filed by Trans Union, LLC.(jfm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Deficiency Notice - No 7.1 Statement Filed Fri 05/02 2:38 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE issued by the Court to Defendant: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (b)(1), A party must: (1) file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Counsel is requested to supplement the docket with an appropriate Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (jfm)
Related: [-]