Delaware District Court
Judge:Jennifer L Hall
Case #: 1:25-cv-00543
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:May 02, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 4:11 PM EDT
Defendant
Julian Brand
Defendant
DMA Labs, Inc.
Represented By
William M. Alleman, Jr
Meluney Alleman & Spence, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Bryan Gross
Represented By
William M. Alleman, Jr
Meluney Alleman & Spence, LLC
contact info
Defendant
ICHI Foundation
Represented By
William M. Alleman, Jr
Meluney Alleman & Spence, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Tyler Christian Pinter
Defendant
Nick Poore
Represented By
William M. Alleman, Jr
Meluney Alleman & Spence, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
HASH Asset Management Ltd.
Represented By
Daniel A. Griffith
Whiteford Taylor Preston LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
6 6 misc Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time) Fri 05/09 2:45 PM
STIPULATION for Remand by HASH Asset Management Ltd.. (Griffith, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 05/07 9:33 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Jennifer L. Hall. Please include the initials of the Judge (JLH) after the case number on all documents filed. (alb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 05/06 1:31 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by HASH Asset Management Ltd. as to Counts II and III of Its Verified Complaint (Griffith, Daniel)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/06 1:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Griffith on behalf of HASH Asset Management Ltd. (Griffith, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Fri 05/02 3:27 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by DMA Labs, Inc., ICHI Foundation. (jfm)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Fri 05/02 3:26 PM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jfm)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 05/02 3:26 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Court of Chancery, Case Number 2025-0374-BWD (Filing fee $405, receipt number ADEDC-4677128)- filed by DMA Labs, Inc., Nick Poore, Bryan Gross, ICHI Foundation.(jfm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet