New Jersey District Court
Judge:Claire C Cecchi
Referred: Jose R Almonte
Case #: 2:25-cv-03779
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Cause9:9 Motion to Confirm Arbitration Loan
Case Filed:May 02, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 4:11 PM EDT
Defendant
IBEW LOCAL 102 WELFARE FUND
Plaintiff
NEUROSPINE PLUS, LLC
Represented By
DEBRA A. CLIFFORD
Gottlieb & Greenspan, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 12, 2025
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 05/12 11:43 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by NEUROSPINE PLUS, LLC. IBEW LOCAL 102 WELFARE FUND served on 5/6/2025, answer due 5/27/2025. (CLIFFORD, DEBRA)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 05/05 11:35 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to IBEW LOCAL 102 WELFARE FUND. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (and)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 04, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Sun 05/04 7:50 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. (mfr)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Fri 05/02 3:52 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by NEUROSPINE PLUS, LLC. (CLIFFORD, DEBRA)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 05/02 3:51 PM
COMPLAINT against IBEW LOCAL 102 WELFARE FUND ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-16225391), filed by NEUROSPINE PLUS, LLC.(CLIFFORD, DEBRA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 7 Summons