Nevada District Court
Judge:Jennifer A Dorsey
Referred: Elayna J Youchah
Case #: 2:25-cv-00773
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:May 02, 2025
Case in other court:Eighth Judicial District Court, A-25-915614-C
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 1:13 PM PDT
Defendant
USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By
Oliver J Pancheri
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Holly Viseur


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
3 3 minord Minute Order Removal Case Mon 05/05 1:52 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/5/2025. By Deputy Clerk: A. Miller. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/20/2025. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/4/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 05/02 1:08 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by USAA Casualty Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent United Services Automobile Association for USAA Casualty Insurance Company added. (Pancheri, Oliver)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition Removal Fri 05/02 1:06 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-25-915614-C, (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANVDC-8039368) by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/12/2025. (Pancheri, Oliver)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Mon 05/05 1:46 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (AMMi)
Related: [-]