Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Ellen F D'Angelo
Case #: 0:25-cv-60876
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:0405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Case Filed:May 02, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 05/07 9:49 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kristin Rogers on behalf of Lee Dudek. Attorney Kristin Rogers added to party Lee Dudek(pty:dft). (Rogers, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
5 5 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Mon 05/05 2:41 PM
ORDER SETTING SOCIAL SECURITY CASE PROCEDURES AND DEADLINES Signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen F. D'Angelo on 5/5/2025. See attached document for full details. (ar24)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 05/05 2:40 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Granting to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen F. D'Angelo on 5/5/2025. See attached document for full details. (ar24)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 05/05 8:37 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Engjell Rroshi. (ar24)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
2 2 order Judge Assignment Mon 05/05 8:31 AM
Judge Assignment to Magistrate Judge Ellen F. D'Angelo (ar24)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/02 4:58 PM
COMPLAINT Engjell Rroshi against Lee Dudek. Filing fees $ 405.00. IFP Filed, filed by Engjell Rroshi. Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Pierre Pierre, Eddy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Motion for IFP