Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Kathleen M Williams
Referred: Jonathan Goodman
Case #: 1:25-cv-22038
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:May 02, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 5:08 PM EDT
Defendant
Patriot Financial Services Inc.
Plaintiff
Jan Carlos Pimentel
Represented By
Zane Charles Hedaya
The Law Offices Of Jibrael S. Hindi
contact info
Gerald Donald Lane, Jr.
The Law Offices Of Jibrael S. Hindi, PLLC
contact info
Faaris Kamal Uddin
The Law Offices Of Jibrael S. Hindi
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
8 8 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Wed 05/07 4:43 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 5/7/2025. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
7 7 5 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Mon 05/05 1:19 PM
ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES: REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for all discovery disputes and non-dispositive pretrial motions. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 5/5/2025. See attached document for full details. (gqa)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 05/05 8:44 AM
Summons Issued as to Patriot Financial Services Inc.. (cds)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Fri 05/02 5:28 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Jan Carlos Pimentel (Uddin, Faaris)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/02 5:26 PM
NOTICE Civil Cover Sheet by Jan Carlos Pimentel (Uddin, Faaris)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE Fri 05/02 5:07 PM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (jas)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 05/02 5:07 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (jas)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 05/02 4:24 PM
COMPLAINT against Patriot Financial Services Inc.. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18419850, filed by Patriot Financial Services Inc..(Uddin, Faaris)
Related: [-]