Maryland District Court
Judge:Gina L Simms
Case #: 8:25-cv-01423
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:May 02, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 5:09 PM EDT
Defendant
Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By
Amber Patrice Cleaver
Kalbaugh Pfund & Messersmith
contact info
Plaintiff
Bonita Washington


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/07 1:50 PM
ANSWER to4 Complaint by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc..(Cleaver, Amber)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
8 8 order 25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order Mon 05/05 10:16 AM
Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 5/5/2025. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice 25 Pct Mag - Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge Mon 05/05 10:15 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. or counsel for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 5/19/2025. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice 25 Pct Mag - Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge Mon 05/05 10:15 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Bonita Washington or counsel for Bonita Washington are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 5/19/2025. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Amended Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions Mon 05/05 10:14 AM
Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
4 4 6 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 05/05 10:14 AM
COMPLAINT against Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., filed by Bonita Washington. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Local Rule Fri 05/02 5:04 PM
Local Rule 103.5(Cleaver, Amber)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7
2 2 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Fri 05/02 4:21 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Home Depot, Inc. for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc..(Cleaver, Amber)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 05/02 4:14 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Prince George's County Circuit Court, case number C-16-CV-25-001650. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number BMDDC-11950770), filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc..(Cleaver, Amber)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 05/02 4:37 PM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
utility Remark - State Court Docs Mon 05/05 10:14 AM
THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]