Oregon District Court
Judge:Karin J Immergut
Case #: 1:25-cv-00732
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:0405g Review of Commissioner's Final Decision
Case Filed:May 02, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
5 5 notice Attorney Appearance Wed 05/07 3:18 PM
Notice of Appearance of Kevin C. Danielson appearing on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration . Filed by on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Danielson, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
4 4 order 4 - Social Security Procedural Order FORM EVENT Tue 05/06 8:41 AM
Social Security Procedural Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Karin J. Immergut. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (hm)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
3 3 order Order on Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed IFP FORM EVENT Mon 05/05 2:37 PM
ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis 2 . Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
2 2 motion Application for Leave to Proceed IFP Fri 05/02 1:33 PM
Application for Leave to Proceed IFP . Filed by Anthony Pruitt. (Linerud, Rory)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - Social Security Fri 05/02 1:28 PM
Complaint to Review Final Decision of Commissioner (In forma pauperis status selected) . Filed by Anthony Pruitt against Commissioner Social Security Administration Social Security Answer is due by 9/2/2025.. (Linerud, Rory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet