Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Joshua D Wolson
Case #: 2:25-cv-02249
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:May 02, 2025
Case in other court:Philadelphia County Court of Common Pleas, 250304164
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 5:10 PM EDT
Defendant
AMAZON LOGISTICS, INC.
Represented By
SALVATORE A. CLEMENTE
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Defendant
AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC
Represented By
SALVATORE A. CLEMENTE
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Defendant
AMAZON.COM, INC.
1200 12TH AVENUE SOUTH SUITE 200
SEATTLE, WA 98144
Represented By
SALVATORE A. CLEMENTE
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Defendant
AMAZON.COM, LLC
Represented By
SALVATORE A. CLEMENTE
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Defendant
Amazon.com.ca, Inc.
Represented By
SALVATORE A. CLEMENTE
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOE 1-2
Defendant
JOHN DOE 3
Defendant
Jalil Marquis Jones-Casey
Plaintiff
Nicholas Cicchini
Represented By
GERALD B. BALDINO, JR.
Sacchetta & Baldino
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
8 8 misc Letter Fri 05/09 3:34 PM
Letter dated May 9, 2025 by AMAZON LOGISTICS, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON.COM, LLC, Amazon.com.ca, Inc.. (PLEVINSKY, LAUREN)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/09 3:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Drew Bell on behalf of AMAZON LOGISTICS, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON.COM, LLC, Amazon.com.ca, Inc. (Bell, Drew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/06 2:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN B. PLEVINSKY on behalf of AMAZON LOGISTICS, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON.COM, LLC, Amazon.com.ca, Inc. with Certificate of Service(PLEVINSKY, LAUREN)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc State Court Record - Attachment Tue 05/06 12:03 PM
State Court record received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (CCP - Philadelphia County cv, )
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
4 4 misc Notice Re: Magistrate Consent Mon 05/05 10:25 AM
Opt In Notice of Procedure to Consent to Random Magistrate Judge Assignment(sbt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent
Friday, May 02, 2025
3 3 cmp Notice of Removal (Attorney) Fri 05/02 5:30 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON LOGISTICS, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC, Amazon.com.ca, Inc., AMAZON.COM, LLC (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-18263137), filed by AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON LOGISTICS, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC, Amazon.com.ca, Inc., AMAZON.COM, LLC.(CLEMENTE, SALVATORE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- PCCP Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Police Report,
Att: 3 PCCP record filings,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Case Management Track Designation Form,
Att: 6 Designation Form
2 2 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Fri 05/02 4:27 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including No with Certificate of Service by AMAZON LOGISTICS, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON.COM, LLC, Amazon.com.ca, Inc..(CLEMENTE, SALVATORE)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (Attorney) Fri 05/02 4:24 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON LOGISTICS, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC, Amazon.com.ca, Inc., AMAZON.COM, LLC (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-18262761), filed by AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON LOGISTICS, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC, Amazon.com.ca, Inc., AMAZON.COM, LLC.(CLEMENTE, SALVATORE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- PCCP Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Police Report,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Designation Form,
Att: 5 Case Management Track Designation Form