South Carolina District Court
Judge:David C Norton
Referred: Paige J Gossett
Case #: 0:25-cv-03724
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983pr (Other)
Case Filed:May 02, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
5 5 order Scheduling Order Wed 05/07 12:14 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 6/10/2025, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/6/2025, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/3/2025, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/1/2025, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/1/2025, Discovery due by 11/26/2025, Motions due by 12/10/2025, ADR Statement due by 1/5/2026, and Mediation Due by 2/4/2026. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 05/07/2025. (cpri)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/07 11:22 AM
ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff by Spartanburg Regional Health Services District, Inc..(Graham, Chad)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Fri 05/02 3:35 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Spartanburg Regional Health Services District, Inc. (apsn)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 05/02 3:33 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Spartanburg Common Pleas, case number 2025CP4201305. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12430659), filed by Spartanburg Regional Health Services District, Inc..(apsn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Documents,
Att: 2 reese Exhibit Acceptance of Service