California Northern District Court
Judge:Virginia K Demarchi
Case #: 5:25-cv-03854
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Property
Case Filed:May 02, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 3:06 PM PDT
Defendant
Credit Sesame, Inc.
Plaintiff
Christopher Miller
Represented By
Laurence D. King
Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 05/02 3:20 PM
Summons Issued as to Credit Sesame, Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 05/02 3:16 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/29/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2025 01:30 PM in San Jose - To be held by Zoom. (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 05/02 3:07 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/16/2025. (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 05/02 2:37 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Christopher Miller (King, Laurence)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Fri 05/02 2:33 PM
Proposed Summons. (King, Laurence)
Related: [-]
1 1 28 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 05/02 2:30 PM
COMPLAINT [receipt: ACANDC-20635858] against Credit Sesame, Inc.. Filed by Christopher Miller.(King, Laurence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet