Mississippi Southern District Court
Judge:David C Bramlette, III
Referred: Bradley W Rath
Case #: 5:25-cv-00047
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:May 02, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 5:06 PM CDT
Defendant
Louisiana Contractors Licensing Service, Inc.
Defendant
Glenda Squyres
Defendant
Ronald Squyres
Plaintiff
National Association of State Contractors' Licensing Agencies
Represented By
Amanda Green Alexander
Alexander Law, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 05/14 4:37 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Association of State Contractors' Licensing Agencies. Glenda Squyres served on 5/10/2025, answer due 6/2/2025. (Alexander, Amanda)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 05/14 4:35 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Association of State Contractors' Licensing Agencies. Ronald Squyres served on 5/10/2025, answer due 6/2/2025. (Alexander, Amanda)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 05/14 4:34 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Association of State Contractors' Licensing Agencies. Louisiana Contractors Licensing Service, Inc. served on 5/12/2025, answer due 6/2/2025. (Alexander, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/09 5:16 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Association of State Contractors' Licensing Agencies (Alexander, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
3 3 notice Notice - (Copyright, Patent, Trademark) Mon 05/05 9:07 AM
NOTICE OF MAILING OF Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding Copyright re1 Complaint. (cwl)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 05/02 4:44 PM
Summons Issued as to Louisiana Contractors Licensing Service, Inc., Glenda Squyres, Ronald Squyres. (cwl)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 05/02 4:36 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Louisiana Contractors Licensing Service, Inc., Glenda Squyres, Ronald Squyres ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMSSDC-5677029), filed by National Association of State Contractors' Licensing Agencies.(cwl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet