Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:William L Campbell, Jr
Referred: Barbara D Holmes
Case #: 1:25-cv-00029
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 02, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 5:07 PM CDT
Defendant
Amy Cook Puckett
Defendant
William Shane Davis
Defendant
Hickman County, Tennessee
Defendant
Robert Nicholson
Defendant
Allan Sullivan
Plaintiff
Stephen House
Represented By
Kyle F. Mothershead
Relentless Advocacy, PLLC
contact info
Aaron Kiefer Rothbaum
Relentless Advocacy, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
6 6 2 pgs order Order Mon 05/05 10:39 AM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 5/5/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (am)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Fri 05/02 4:21 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 8/6/2025 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (sb)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 05/02 4:19 PM
Summons issued as to Amy Cook Puckett, William Shane Davis, Hickman County, Tennessee, Robert Nicholson, Allan Sullivan. Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office. (sb)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Fri 05/02 4:17 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (sb)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Fri 05/02 4:17 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (sb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/02 4:16 PM
COMPLAINT against Amy Cook Puckett, William Shane Davis, Hickman County, Tennessee, Robert Nicholson, Allan Sullivan (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4314600), filed by Stephen House.(sb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet
misc Annotation - Bar Status Fri 05/02 4:22 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Aaron Kiefer Rothbaum, Kyle F. Mothershead admitted to this court . (sb)
Related: [-]