Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:William L Campbell, Jr
Referred: Alistair Newbern
Case #: 3:25-cv-00503
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 02, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 5:08 PM CDT
Defendant
Erie Insurance Company
Plaintiff
Craig Cowan
Represented By
Jonathan L. Bobbitt
Mcwherter Scott & Bobbitt Plc (franklin Tn Office)
contact info
Emily Alcorn
Mcwherter Scott & Bobbitt Plc (franklin Tn Office)
contact info
Nancy R. Steer
Mcwherter Scott & Bobbitt Plc (franklin Tn Office)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
8 8 2 pgs order Order Mon 05/05 10:40 AM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 5/5/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (am)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
7 7 misc Business Entity Disclosure Statement Fri 05/02 3:23 PM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Craig Cowan. (Bobbitt, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Fri 05/02 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 7/9/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (ch)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Fri 05/02 3:21 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ch)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Fri 05/02 3:20 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ch)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Fri 05/02 3:20 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ch)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 05/02 3:20 PM
Summons issued as to Erie Insurance Company. Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office. (ch)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 05/02 3:18 PM
COMPLAINT against Erie Insurance Company (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4314498), filed by Craig Cowan.(ch)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Certified Policy,
Att: 2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet
misc Annotation - Bar Status Fri 05/02 3:21 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Jonathan L. Bobbitt, Nancy R. Steer, and Emily Alcorn admitted to this court . (ch)
Related: [-]