Texas Northern District Court
Judge:David C Godbey
Referred: Rebecca Rutherford
Case #: 3:25-cv-01101
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 02, 2025
Terminated:May 08, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 5:10 PM CDT
Defendant
Kevin Andrews
Defendant
Jared Julian
Defendant
Andrew J Passons
Defendant
Jennifer Yates
Plaintiff
Justin Randall Jones
4255 Cotton Gin Unit 125
Frisco, TX 75034


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
misc Acknowledgment of Case Transfer Fri 05/09 2:31 PM
Case transferred from NDTX has been opened in the Eastern District of Texas, Sherman Division as case number 4:25-cv-00493. (ykp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
11 11 3 pgs order Order Transferring to Another District Fri 05/09 8:47 AM
Order Transferring to Another District: Case transferred to Sherman Division of Eastern District of Texas. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 5/8/2025) (cfk)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Manual Filing Thu 05/08 6:47 AM
Notice of Manual Filing by All Plaintiffs re7 Request for Clerk to Issue Document Request for Immediate Issuance of Summonses and Enforcement Activation (Rule 4(c)(3)) (Jones, Justin)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Manual Filing Thu 05/08 4:05 AM
Notice of Manual Filing of Notice of Rule 36 Default, Summary Judgment Enforcement, and Final Exhibits by All Plaintiffs Notice of Rule 36 Default, Summary Judgment Enforcement, and Final Exhibits (Jones, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s),
Att: 2 Exhibit(s)
utility Case Transferred Out - District Transfer (Public Entry) Fri 05/09 8:50 AM
Interdistrict Transfer to Eastern District of Texas, Sherman Division; notice sent via email. All documents available electronically. If receiving court cannot upload, documents are available from PACER Related [+]. Counsel advised to file future documents in Eastern District of Texas, Sherman Division. (cfk)
Related: [-] cord does not contain restricted documents
Monday, May 05, 2025
8 8 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Tue 05/06 10:16 AM
ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS (Proposed Order Granting Emergency Possession, Access, and Restoration of Parental Rights) by Plaintiff Justin Randall Jones re:3 Complaint. (axm)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
7 7 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Fri 05/02 5:03 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Justin Randall Jones. (kcr)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Temporary Restraining Order Injunction Fri 05/02 5:02 PM
Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunctive Relief filed by Justin Randall Jones. (kcr)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/02 5:01 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE of State Court Escalation and Fraudulent Orders filed by Justin Randall Jones. (kcr)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 05/02 5:00 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Justin Randall Jones. (kcr)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Complaint Fri 05/02 4:57 PM
COMPLAINT against Kevin Andrews, Jared Julian, Andrew J Passons, Jennifer Yates filed by Justin Randall Jones. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (kcr) (kcr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (5/2/2025) Additional Page(s)
2 2 notice Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party Fri 05/02 4:56 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (kcr)
Related: [-]
1 1 qcref Godbey Fri 05/02 4:56 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter or electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (kcr)
Related: [-]