California Central District Court
Judge:Cynthia Valenzuela
Referred: Alka Sagar
Case #: 2:25-mc-00037
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:May 06, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, May 12, 2025
5 5 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 05/12 3:50 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ping Wang, identifying Ping Wang. (Ryan, Bing)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Mon 05/12 3:18 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,2 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Attachment(s): # 2 Declaration Ryan Declaration ISO Ex Parte Application, # 3 Declaration Wang Declaration ISO Ex Parte Application, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet. The document(s) should have been filed separately using their true events. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (sh)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 05/12 3:14 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cynthia Valenzuela and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (sh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
2 2 cmp Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 05/07 9:23 AM
APPLICATION Approve Third Party Subpeona with filing fee previously paid ($52.00 paid on 5/2/2025, receipt number 39632368), filed by Plaintiff Ping Wang. (Attorney Bing Zhang Ryan added to party Ping Wang(pty:pla))(Ryan, Bing)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum Memorandum ISO Ex Parte Application,
Att: 2 Declaration Ryan Declaration ISO Ex Parte Application,
Att: 3 Declaration Wang Declaration ISO Ex Parte Application,
Att: 4 Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
1 1 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Tue 05/06 12:45 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: You have attempted to open this case electronically but have failed to upload successfully the required PDF version of any initiating document, such as a complaint or notice of removal. You must file an initiating document within two business days of this notice or the docket for this case number will be closed. (sh)
Related: [-]