Shannon v. Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company et al
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Anthony J Battaglia |
Referred: | Michelle M Pettit |
Case #: | 3:25-cv-01123 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1446bc Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | May 02, 2025 |
Case in other court: | Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, 24CU009865C |
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 5:04 PM PDT |
Defendant
Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does 1 through 20
|
|
Plaintiff
Marcus Shannon
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, May 05, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation & Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2025 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit. Joint Discovery Plan due 6/13/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit on 5/5/2025. (maq) |
|
Friday, May 02, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company. Identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company. (axi) (rmc) |
|
2 | 2
![]() ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company. (axi) (rmc) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-19860649.), filed by Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company. The new case number is 3:25-cv-1123-AJB-MMP. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit are assigned to the case.(axi) (rmc) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |