Nevada District Court
Judge:Andrew P Gordon
Referred: Brenda Weksler
Case #: 2:25-cv-00778
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause28:451 Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:May 02, 2025
Case in other court:Eighth Judicial District Court, Clark County, NV, A-25-917011-C
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 5:05 PM PDT
Defendant
Goodwrx, LLC
8400 W. Sunset Rd Suite 300
Las Vegas, NV 89113
Represented By
Mary F Chapman
Law Office Of Mary F. Chapman Ltd
contact info
Plaintiff
Lajuana Moten


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
7 7 4 pgs order Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Session Tue 05/06 4:37 PM
ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Session. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 7/18/2025 at 09:30 AM in LV Chambers - Videoconference before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/6/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
Related: [-]
6 6 minord Minute Order Tue 05/06 11:41 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/6/2025. The undersigned is setting an early neutral evaluation. The parties must discuss settlement and exchange an initial settlement offer and an initial counteroffer by July 2, 2025. The parties must also file, no later than July 3, 2025, a joint statement with the parties' position as to whether holding the early neutral evaluation would be futile. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Standing Order Tue 05/06 8:23 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
4 4 minord Minute Order Removal Case Mon 05/05 3:31 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/5/2025. By Deputy Clerk: A. Miller. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/20/2025. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/4/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice ENE Notice Mon 05/05 3:30 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe will be the evaluating judge in this case. No ENE will be conducted in cases subject to arbitration. Parties to cases subject to mandatory arbitration, as well as parties who agree to arbitrate, must notify the Court of the same no later than 14 days after the date of this Notice. Failure to do so may result in sanctions. (no image attached) (AMMi)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 05/02 4:39 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Goodwrx, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Chapman, Mary)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition Removal Fri 05/02 4:33 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Clark County, NV, Case Number A-25-917011-C, (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANVDC-8039820) by Goodwrx, LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/12/2025. (Chapman, Mary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Mon 05/05 3:30 PM
Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (AMMi)
Related: [-]