Oregon District Court
Judge:Andrew D Hallman
Case #: 2:25-cv-00734
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:May 02, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 5:05 PM PDT
Defendant
Morrow County Health District
564 E Pioneer Dr.
Heppner, OR 97836
Defendant
Emily Roberts Reynolds
Plaintiff
Samantha Ward
Represented By
Anne Devlan Foster
Smith Foster King LLP
contact info
Samuel T. Smith
Smith Foster King LLP
contact info
Matthew A. Clarkson
Smith Foster King LLP
contact info
Jaimee King
Smith Foster King LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
9 9 service Waiver of Service Summons Wed 05/07 9:51 AM
Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Emily Roberts Reynolds waiver sent on 5/5/2025. Filed by Samantha Ward. (Smith, Samuel)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Waiver of Service Summons Wed 05/07 9:49 AM
Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Morrow County Health District waiver sent on 5/5/2025. Filed by Samantha Ward. (Smith, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
7 7 motion Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/06 9:04 AM
Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Matt Crotty. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9838062. Filed by Samantha Ward. (Crotty, Matt)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 05/05 9:29 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Morrow County Health District, Emily Roberts Reynolds. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rks)
Related: [-]
5 5 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Mon 05/05 9:23 AM
Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Andrew D. Hallman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 9/2/2025. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/2/2025. Pretrial Order is due by 10/2/2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrew D. Hallman. (rks)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
4 4 service Proposed Summons Fri 05/02 4:22 PM
Proposed Summons to Morrow County Health District Filed by Samantha Ward. (Smith, Samuel)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Proposed Summons Fri 05/02 4:21 PM
Proposed Summons to Emily Roberts Reynolds Filed by Samantha Ward. (Smith, Samuel)
Related: [-]
2 2 oth_doc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 05/02 4:14 PM
Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint1 . Filed by Samantha Ward. (Smith, Samuel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/02 4:07 PM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9836012 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Samantha Ward against All Defendants. (Smith, Samuel)
Related: [-]