Pennsylvania Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John C Melaragno
Case #: 1:25-bk-10248
Case Filed:May 02, 2025

Debtor
Whiskey River Brewing & BBQ Inc.
215 Clarion St
Wilcox, PA 15870-2909
Represented By
Whiskey River Brewing & BBQ Inc.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Joseph B. Spero
3213 West 26th Street
Erie, PA 16506
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
1000 Liberty Avenue Suite 1316
Pittsburgh, PA 15222


Docket last updated: 05/03/2025 12:02 AM EDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 Fri 05/02 11:06 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $338 Filed by Whiskey River Brewing & BBQ Inc. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/29/2025. Declaration of Schedules due 5/16/2025. Schedule A/B due 5/16/2025. Schedule D due 5/16/2025. Schedule E/F due 5/16/2025. Schedule G due 5/16/2025. Schedule H due 5/16/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs due 5/16/2025. Summary of schedules due 5/16/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 5/16/2025. (jmar) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2025 (dpas)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Fri 05/02 12:31 PM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (dpas)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Mailing Matrix -Court- Fri 05/02 12:35 PM
Mailing Matrix. Total number of creditors added to the case: 10. (dpas)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Pay Filing Fee in Installments Fri 05/02 12:38 PM
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments . Filed by Debtor Whiskey River Brewing & BBQ Inc. . (dpas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
5 5 court Notice Regarding Creditor Matrix Fri 05/02 12:39 PM
Notice Regarding Creditor Matrix (dpas)
Related: [-]
6 6 court Notice of Filing Deficiencies Pro Se Cases Fri 05/02 12:40 PM
Notice of Filing Deficiencies. Assigned Judge: MELARAGNO. Appointed Trustee: SPERO. Pursuant to Local Rule 1017-2, the United States Trustee is deemed to have filed a Motion To Dismiss this case, and that Motion will be deemed GRANTED, if any deadline set forth in the first docket entry is not met. Related [+]. (dpas)
Related: [-] :1 Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 filed by Debtor Whiskey River Brewing & BBQ Inc.
7 7 order Pay Filing Fees in Installments Fri 05/02 4:37 PM
Order Denying Application To Pay Filing Fees In Installments. On or before May 12, 2025, the Debtor shall pay the Chapter 7 filing fee in full, or the case will be dismissed without further notice or hearing. Related [+]. Signed on 5/2/2025. (jmar)
Related: [-] 4
8 8 court Hearing Set E Fri 05/02 4:47 PM
Order Scheduling an Order to Show Cause Hearing as to why the case should not be dismissed for failure to obtain counsel for the Debtor. Related [+]. Show Cause hearing to be held on 5/15/2025 at 02:00 PM at Bankruptcy Courtroom, U.S. Courthouse, 17 South Park Row, Erie. Edward Schaneburger, Owner to PERSONALLY APPEAR. (jmar)
Related: [-] :1 Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 filed by Debtor Whiskey River Brewing & BBQ Inc.