Connecticut District Court
Judge:Omar A Williams
Case #: 3:25-cv-00705
Nature of Suit371 Torts - Personal Property - Truth in Lending
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:May 01, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 03, 2025 12:25 AM EDT
Defendant
Latoya Adell
Defendant
Bank of America
Plaintiff
Clayton Samuel Wilson
111 Grandview Ave
Bridgeport, CT 06606


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
8 8 intord Standing Order re: Letters Fri 05/02 4:12 PM
Standing Order re: Letters. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 05/01/2025. (Kelsey, N)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake) Fri 05/02 4:10 PM
Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Kelsey, N)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Standing Protective Order (Intake) Fri 05/02 4:09 PM
Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 05/01/2025. (Kelsey, N)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Electronic Filing Order Fri 05/02 4:08 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 05/01/2025. (Kelsey, N)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Fri 05/02 4:07 PM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/30/2025; Discovery due by 10/31/2025; Dispositive Motions due by 12/5/2025, Signed by Clerk on 05/01/2025. (Kelsey, N)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice re: Disclosure Statement Fri 05/02 9:52 AM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(b), a disclosure statement required under Rule 7.1(a) must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 5/1/2025. (Fanelle, N.)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 05/02 9:51 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Clayton Samuel Wilson. (Fanelle, N.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/02 9:51 AM
COMPLAINT against Latoya Adell, Bank of America, filed by Clayton Samuel Wilson. (Fanelle, N.)
Related: [-]
utility NEW Case Assignment Fri 05/02 9:59 AM
CASE ASSIGNMENT: District Judge Omar A. Williams assigned to the case. If the District Judge issues an Order of Referral to a Magistrate Judge for any matter other than settlement, the matter will be referred to Magistrate Judge Robert A. Richardson. Related [+]
Related: [-] is, J