Maryland District Court
Judge:Stephanie A Gallagher
Case #: 1:25-cv-01379
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage/Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Sunday May 04, 2025 4:12 AM EDT
Defendant
Aerotek Inc.
7301 Parkway Drive
Hanover, MD 21076
Defendant
Kelly & Associates Insurance Group, Inc.
Plaintiff
Cesar Mejia
Represented By
Duane O King
The Law Office Of Duane O. King
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
5 5 Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 5/1/2025. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Cesar Mejia or counsel for Cesar Mejia are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 5/15/2025. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Aerotek Inc., Kelly & Associates Insurance Group, Inc.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 QC NOTICE:1 Complaint, filed by Cesar Mejia was filed incorrectly. **Civil Cover sheet and summons were not flattened. All documents MUST BE FLATTENED or OPTIMIZED prior to uploading to CM/ECF. In the future, Failure to comply will result in your filing being REJECTED. Instructions for flattening or optimizing a document. Select File --> Print --> Adobe PDF or Microsoft Print to PDF. No action is required.. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
1 1 40 pgs COMPLAINT against Cesar Mejia ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11944996.), filed by Cesar Mejia.(King, Duane) (ybs).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons
Att: 4 (5/1/2025) Civil Cover Sheet Flattened,
Att: 5 (5/1/2025) Flattened Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 05/02 10:20 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]