Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Eli J Richardson
Referred: Barbara D Holmes
Case #: 3:25-cv-00499
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:May 01, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 03, 2025 3:30 AM CDT
Defendant
Luxor Staffing, Inc.
Plaintiff
Johnna Palermo
Represented By
Anne Bennett Hunter
Hunter Law Firm
contact info
Kaitlyn Elizabeth Lyons
Hunter Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Order Wed 05/07 12:39 PM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 5/7/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ch)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Fri 05/02 3:28 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 8/6/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (sb)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 05/02 3:26 PM
Summons issued as to Luxor Staffing, Inc. Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office. (sb)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Fri 05/02 3:25 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (sb)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Fri 05/02 3:24 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (sb)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Fri 05/02 3:24 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (sb)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Fri 05/02 3:29 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Anne Bennett Hunter, Kaitlyn Elizabeth Lyons admitted to this court . (sb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/02 3:23 PM
COMPLAINT against Luxor Staffing, Inc. (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4314153), filed by Johnna Palermo.(sb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet