Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00243
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 03, 2025 2:27 AM CDT
Defendant
Maria Luisa Fortuna-Martinez (1)
Represented By
Elizabeth Ann O'Connell
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Corpus Christi Interpreter
contact info
Federal Public Defender - Corpus Christi
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info
Robert Douglas Thorpe, Jr
Assistant Us Atty
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/03/2025 3:50 AM CDT
Friday, April 11, 2025
Arrest of Maria Luisa Fortuna-Martinez. (jdr2) [2:25-mj-00174]
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 12, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Maria Luisa Fortuna-Martinez (1), filed. (Kenedy) Initial Appearance set for 4/14/2025 at 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock (jrm2) [2:25-mj-00174]
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 13, 2025
2 2 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock) Parties notified. (jdr2) [2:25-mj-00174]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Elizabeth Ann O'Connell, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Maria Luisa Fortuna-Martinez, filed. (O'Connell, Elizabeth) [2:25-mj-00174]
Related: [-]
Interpreter needed as to Maria Luisa Fortuna-Martinez. Language: SPANISH. Corpus Christi Interpreter for Maria Luisa Fortuna-Martinez added. (jdr2) [2:25-mj-00174]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Maria Luisa Fortuna-Martinez (Defendant informed of rights) held on 4/14/2025. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Court grants request for appointment of counsel. Defendant consents to this hearing by video conference. Rights to consular notification given. The Court on their own motion, orders a Detention Hearing. Defense counsel advised Court that Defendant's family may hire an attorney. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 4/17/2025 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby. Appearances: Yasmine Kathrina Tucker, AUSA; Chris Jenkins for Defendant; USPO: Jesus Botello; USM: Cordero, Escaleras, Silva. (Digital # 9:47-9:55) (ERO: Griselda Green) (Interpreter: J. Zambrana/used) Deft remanded to custody. (jdr2) [2:25-mj-00174]
Related: [-]
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Robert Douglas Thorpe, Jr appearing for USA, filed. (Thorpe, Robert) [2:25-mj-00174]
Related: [-]
3 3 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Maria Luisa Fortuna-Martinez. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock) Parties notified. (jdr2) [2:25-mj-00174]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby: PRELIMINARY EXAMINATION & DETENTION HEARING as to Maria Luisa Fortuna-Martinez held on 4/17/2025 Preliminary examination held. Testimony presented. Government witness #1-Agent Raymundo Jacquez. Discussion held and arguments heard. Court finds probable cause. Detention hearing continued to allow the USPO to prepare a complete full pretrial report. Detention Hearing set for 4/24/2025 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby. Appearances: Young Min C. Burkett, AUSA; Elizabeth O'Connell f/Defendant; USPO: R. Cavazos; USM: S. Cordero. (Digital # 11:02-11:22) (ERO: G. Green) (Interpreter: M. Macossay/used) Deft remanded to custody. (kwp2) [2:25-mj-00174]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
4 4 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Maria Luisa Fortuna-Martinez, filed. (rm2) [2:25-mj-00174]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
5 5 Amended Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Maria Luisa Fortuna-Martinez, filed. (nrc2) [2:25-mj-00174]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby: PRELIMINARY EXAMINATION & DETENTION HEARING as to Maria Luisa Fortuna-Martinez held on 4/24/2025. Testimony presented. Government witness #1-Alejandro Gonzalez. Discussion held and arguments heard. Court finds probable cause. Arguments heard on the issue of detention. Court denies bond. Order to be entered. Appearances:AUSA Ashley Martin. Elizabeth Ann O'Connell. USPO-Jesus Botello. USM-S. Cordero. (Digital # 11:22-11:47)(ERO:kathie calderon) (Interpreter:Luz McClellan) Deft remanded to custody, filed. (kwp2) [2:25-mj-00174]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
6 6 2 pgs MEMORANDUM OPINION ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Maria Luisa Fortuna-Martinez (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified. (jrm2) Emailed to USMS on 4/25/2025 (jrm2). [2:25-mj-00174]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
7 7 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Maria Luisa Fortuna-Martinez (1) count(s) 1, filed. (as2)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
8 8 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Maria Luisa Fortuna-Martinez, filed. (as2)
Related: [-]
9 9 SCHEDULING ORDER as to Maria Luisa Fortuna-Martinez. Arraignment set for 5/8/2025 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby.. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/28/2025 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby.. Jury Trial set for 6/9/2025 at 08:30 AM before Judge David S. Morales. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby) Parties notified. (as2)
Related: [-]