Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00251
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 03, 2025 2:30 AM CDT
Defendant
Camarin Janae Flores-San Agustin (2)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - Corpus Christi
contact info
Rachel Elizabeth Braver
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Defendant
Mitchell J McWilliams (1)
Represented By
Simon Brian Purnell
Griffin Purnell, LLC
contact info
Material Witness
Crisoforo Campos-Bravo
Represented By
Gabriel R Salais
Law Office Of Scott Ellison PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info
Ashley Anne Pruitt
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/03/2025 3:54 AM CDT
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
Arrest of Mitchell J McWilliams. (kwp2) [2:25-mj-00182]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Camarin Janae Flores-San Agustin. (kwp2) [2:25-mj-00182]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Ashley Anne Pruitt appearing for USA, filed. (Pruitt, Ashley) [2:25-mj-00182]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Mitchell J McWilliams (1), Camarin Janae Flores-San Agustin (2), filed. (Brooks) Initial Appearance set for 4/17/2025 at 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby (lb2) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/16/2025) (lb2). [2:25-mj-00182]
Related: [-]
2 2 Affidavit for Material Witness(es) Crisoforo Campos-Bravo as to Mitchell J McWilliams, Camarin Janae Flores-San Agustin. Initial Appearance for Material Witness set for 4/17/2025 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby, filed. (lb2) (Main Document 2 replaced on 4/16/2025) (lb2). [2:25-mj-00182]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Material Witness(es): Crisoforo Campos-Bravo. Gabriel R Salais appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby) Parties notified. (mej2) [2:25-mj-00182]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby) Parties notified. (mej2) [2:25-mj-00182]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Defendant Mitchell J McWilliams. Simon Brian Purnell appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby) Parties notified. (mej2) [2:25-mj-00182]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby: INITIAL APPEARANCE OF MATERIAL WITNESS(ES) CRISOFORO CAMPOS-BRAVO as to Mitchell J McWilliams, Camarin Janae Flores-San Agustin (Material Witness(es) informed of rights) held on 4/17/2025. Material Witness consents to this hearing by video conference. Court finds Material Witness qualifies for appointed counsel and counsel is appointed and present in court., AUSA states the material witness has prior removal/immigration history and moves for detention., Material Witness counsel states his/her client wishes to waive their detention hearing without prejudice., Rights to consular notification given; material witness or their counsel may notify the Court if they request notification., Material Witness requests the consular officials be notified; AUSA to instruct case agent to make notification. Appearances: Young Min C. Burkett, AUSA; Gabriel Salais f/Material Witness; USM: S. Cordero. (Digital # 9:35-9:44) (ERO: G. Green) (Interpreter: J. Zambrana and /used). (kwp2) [2:25-mj-00182]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Mitchell J McWilliams (Defendant informed of rights) held on 4/17/2025. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Financial Affidavit executed. Court grants request for appointment of counsel. Defendant consents to this hearing by video conference. Government recommends bond based on Defendant's minimal criminal history. Court grants bond. Court sets bond as follows: 1. $30,000 unsecured Bond. ; 1a. Interviewed by the USPO and personal information verified by the USPO prior to release. 2. The defendant must not violate federal state, or local law while on bond. 3. Pretrial Supervision in the WDTX - Austin Division. Follow instructions given by USPO; must keep attorney and USPO informed of their current address and phone number. 4. Maintain or actively seek employment or enroll in a full-time educational program. If unable to work or attend school, provide proof to the USPO. 5. Surrender any passport to the USPO as directed. Obtain no passport. 6. Travel restricted to the WDTX-Austin Division with permission to travel to Corpus Christi, TX for court appearances and attorney conferences. Outside travel to be pre-approved by the U.S. Probation Office. No travel to Mexico nor any foreign country without written Court approval. 7. Avoid all contact with potential co-defendants, victims or potential victims. He/She may have contact with the co-defendant however they must not discuss this case unless both attorneys are present. 8. Refrain from possessing a firearm, destructive device, or other dangerous weapons. Any weapons must be removed from the residence prior to release on bond. 9. Refrain from excessive use of alcohol. 10. Submit to any drug testing as directed by the U.S. Probation Office. 11. Report Contact with Law Enforcement.. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 4/22/2025 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby.. Appearances: Young Min C. Burkett, AUSA; Simon Purnell for Defendant; USPO: R. Cavazos; USM: S. Cordero. (Digital # 10:16-10:37) (ERO: G. Green) (Interpreter: not used) Deft remanded to custody. (kwp2) [2:25-mj-00182]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Rachel Elizabeth Braver, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Camarin Janae Flores-San Agustin, filed. (Braver, Rachel) [2:25-mj-00182]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Camarin Janae Flores-San Agustin (Defendant informed of rights) held on 4/17/2025. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Financial Affidavit executed. Court grants request for appointment of counsel. Defendant consents to this hearing by video conference. Government recommends bond based on Defendant's minimal criminal history. Court grants bond. Court sets bond as follows: 1. $30,000 unsecured Bond. ; 1a. Interviewed by the USPO and personal information verified by the USPO prior to release. 2. The defendant must not violate federal state, or local law while on bond. 3. Pretrial Supervision in the WDTX - Austin Division. Follow instructions given by USPO; must keep attorney and USPO informed of their current address and phone number. 4. Maintain or actively seek employment or enroll in a full-time educational program. If unable to work or attend school, provide proof to the USPO. 5. Surrender any passport to the USPO as directed. Obtain no passport. 6. Travel restricted to the WDTX-Austin Division with permission to travel to Corpus Christi, TX for court appearances and attorney conferences. Outside travel to be pre-approved by the U.S. Probation Office. No travel to Mexico nor any foreign country without written Court approval. 7. Avoid all contact with potential co-defendants, victims or potential victims. He/She may have contact with the co-defendant however they must not discuss this case unless both attorneys are present. 8. Refrain from possessing a firearm, destructive device, or other dangerous weapons. Any weapons must be removed from the residence prior to release on bond. 9. Refrain from excessive use of alcohol. 10. Submit to any drug testing as directed by the U.S. Probation Office. 11. Report Contact with Law Enforcement. 12. Participate in mental health treatment/counseling as directed by the USPO. Provide list of medications to the USPO upon request. Provide information regarding MH treatment, medications etc to the upon request. Provide consent to the USPO to obtain information regarding MH treatment etc.. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 4/22/2025 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby.. Appearances: Young Min C. Burkett, AUSA; Christopher Jenkins for Defendant; USPO: R. Cavazos; USM: S. Cordero. (Digital # 10:16-10:37) (ERO: G. Green) (Interpreter: not used) Deft remanded to custody. (kwp2) [2:25-mj-00182]
Related: [-]
6 6 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Mitchell J McWilliams, filed. [2:25-mj-00182]
Related: [-]
7 7 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Camarin Janae Flores-San Agustin, filed. [2:25-mj-00182]
Related: [-]
8 8 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Mitchell J McWilliams. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby) Parties notified. (kwp2) [2:25-mj-00182]
Related: [-]
9 9 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Camarin Janae Flores-San Agustin. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby) Parties notified. (kwp2) [2:25-mj-00182]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Mitchell J McWilliams. Mitchell J McWilliams (1) $30,000 unsecured bond (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified. (lb2) [2:25-mj-00182]
Related: [-]
11 11 Appearance Bond Entered as to Mitchell J McWilliams in amount of $ 30,000 unsecured bond,, filed. (lb2) [2:25-mj-00182]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment bond
12 12 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Camarin Janae Flores-San Agustin. Camarin Janae Flores-San Agustin (2) $30,000 unsecured bond. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified. (lb2) [2:25-mj-00182]
Related: [-]
13 13 Appearance Bond Entered as to Camarin Janae Flores-San Agustin in amount of $ 30,000 unsecured bond, filed. (lb2) [2:25-mj-00182]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment bond
14 14 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Mitchell J McWilliams, filed. (jc2) [2:25-mj-00182]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
15 15 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Camarin Janae Flores-San Agustin, filed. (acg2) [2:25-mj-00182]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
**Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Mitchell J McWilliams: Bond Hearing set by video for 4/22/2025 at 11:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby is cancelled; to be reset. (kwp2) [2:25-mj-00182]
Related: [-]
***Reset Hearings as to Mitchell J McWilliams: Bond Hearing set by video for 4/22/2025 at 11:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby (kwp2) [2:25-mj-00182]
Related: [-]
16 16 WAIVER of Preliminary Examination by Mitchell J McWilliams, filed. (Purnell, Simon) [2:25-mj-00182]
Related: [-]
17 17 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Camarin Janae Flores-San Agustin, filed. (Braver, Rachel) [2:25-mj-00182]
Related: [-]
18 18 NOTICE OF SETTING as to Mitchell J McWilliams, Camarin Janae Flores-San Agustin. Bond Hearing set by video for 4/22/2025 at 11:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby, filed. (kwp2) [2:25-mj-00182]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby: BOND HEARING as to Mitchell J McWilliams, Camarin Janae Flores-San Agustin held on 4/22/2025. Court advises parties the USPO recommends some modifications to the bond conditions for each defendant. No objections from Defense Counsel. Court states all conditions previously set shall remain. Court modifies bond for Defendant McWilliams to include the following: 1.Refrain from any use of alcohol (modified); 2. Refrain from use or unlawful possession of a narcotic drug or other controlled substance unless prescribed by a licensed medical practitioner; 3. Participate in a program of inpatient or outpatient substance abuse therapy and counseling as directed by the U.S. Probation Office; 4.Defendant agrees to attend all scheduled material witness depositions. Defendant agrees and stipulates that failure to attend a scheduled deposition constitutes a knowing waiver of the Defendants right to be present during the deposition and may constitute a waiver of Defendants right to confront and cross-examine the witness(es). Court modifies bond for Defendant Flores-San Agustin to include the following:1.Refrain from use or unlawful possession of a narcotic drug or other controlled substance unless prescribed by a licensed medical practitioner; 2.Participate in a program of inpatient or outpatient substance abuse therapy and counseling as directed by the U.S. Probation Office; 3.Defendant agrees to attend all scheduled material witness depositions. Defendant agrees and stipulates that failure to attend a scheduled deposition constitutes a knowing waiver of the Defendants right to be present during the deposition and may constitute a waiver of Defendants right to confront and cross-examine the witness(es). Appearances:AUSA Izaak Bruce. Simon Brian Purnell, Rachel Elizabeth Braver. USPO-Alyssa Barrera. USM-G. Gonzalez. (Digital # 11:16-11:20)(ERO:K. Calderon) Deft 1,2 continued on bond, filed. (kwp2) [2:25-mj-00182]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
19 19 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Mitchell J McWilliams (1) count(s) 1, 2, Camarin Janae Flores-San Agustin (2) count(s) 1, 2, filed. (ntg2)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
20 20 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Mitchell J McWilliams, Camarin Janae Flores-San Agustin, filed. (ntg2)
Related: [-]
21 21 SCHEDULING ORDER as to Mitchell J McWilliams, Camarin Janae Flores-San Agustin. Arraignment set for 5/8/2025 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby.. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/28/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby.. Jury Trial set for 6/9/2025 at 08:30 AM before Judge David S. Morales. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby) Parties notified. (ntg2)
Related: [-]