Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 1:25-cr-20151
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 03, 2025 4:24 AM EDT
Defendant
Mairilin Munoz (2)
Represented By
Omar Antonio Lopez
Omar A. Lopez, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Freddy Urribarri (1)
Represented By
Frank J. Gaviria
Frank J Gaviria PA
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Dan Bernstein
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/03/2025 6:31 AM EDT
Thursday, April 03, 2025
1 1 MOTION TO SEAL by USA as to Freddy Urribarri, Mairilin Munoz. (at)
Related: [-]
2 2 SEALED ORDER GRANTING1 Motion TO SEAL as to Freddy Urribarri (1), Mairilin Munoz (2). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez on 4/3/2025). (See attached document for full details). (at)
Related: [-]
3 3 INDICTMENT as to Freddy Urribarri (1) count(s) 1, 2, 4, 7, Mairilin Munoz (2) count(s) 1, 3, 5-6, 8-9. FORFEITURE ALLEGATIONS. (at) (at).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (4/4/2025) Restricted Unredacted Indictment