Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 3:25-mj-00324
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2025
Terminated:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 03, 2025 2:23 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Douglas Burton Brasher-DOJ
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Tiffany Hope Eggers-DOJ
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Ndtx
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Robert Wilson King (1)
Terminated: 04/22/2025
Represented By
Marti Rachel Morgan-FPD
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Federal Public Defender
Federal Public Defender - Dallas
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/03/2025 3:44 AM CDT
Thursday, April 03, 2025
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until the defendant has been arrested/appeared.) as to Robert Wilson King (1). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (mcrd)
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION for Detention and MOTION to Continue filed by USA as to Robert Wilson King. (mcrd)
Related: [-]