Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741

California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:25-cv-03792
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:May 01, 2025
Case in other court:Florida Northern, 4:25-cv-00172
Last checked: Sunday May 04, 2025 1:29 AM PDT
Defendant
Monsanto Company
Plaintiff
Joel Johnson
Represented By
Valerie S Farwell
Hendler Flores Law - Austin Tx
contact info
Plaintiff
Yolanda M. Johnson
Represented By
Valerie S Farwell
Hendler Flores Law - Austin Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
9 9 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Fri 05/02 11:10 AM
Case transferred in from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 4:25-cv-00172. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Fri 05/02 11:31 AM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern District of Florida, 4:25-cv-00172-AW-MAF, Yolanda Johnson v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:25-cv-03792-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order CTO-515 cc: JPMDL (slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
8 8 Interdistrict Transfer to the Northern District of California, San Francisco Division located at Phillip Burton Federal Building & United States Courthouse, Ofice of the Clerk, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, CA 94102. (kdm)
Related: [-]
7 7 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-515) re 1 Complaint. Case transferred to the Northern District of California. MDL No.2741 (kdm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
6 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (FARWELL, VALERIE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
5 5 ORDER - Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. 2 , is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 4/17/25. (sjb)
Related: [-]
4 4 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The clerk will issue summonses upon submission. You may obtain the 2-page summons form by visiting the court website at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. Click on Attorneys, select Attorney Forms, and select Summons in a Civil Action-AO 440. (kdm)
Related: [-]
3 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Counsel Is Advised By This Entry, That A Civil Cover Sheet Should Be Filed As A Separate Entry Using The Event Selection "Civil Cover Sheet" Which Is Found Under "Other Filings" Under "Other Documents". Please Re-File The Civil Cover Sheet. (kdm)
Related: [-]
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re:2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Valerie Farwell. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (kdm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
2 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Valerie Farwell.( Filing fee $ 219 receipt number AFLNDC-9440627.) by YOLANDA JOHNSON. (FARWELL, VALERIE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Cert. of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
1 1 COMPLAINT against MONSANTO COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AFLNDC-9440604.), filed by YOLANDA JOHNSON, JOEL JOHNSON. (FARWELL, VALERIE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet