California Northern District Court
Judge:Kandis A Westmore
Case #: 4:25-cv-03806
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:May 01, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court of California, County of Marin, CV0005502
Last checked: Sunday May 04, 2025 1:30 AM PDT
Defendant
Porsche Cars North America, Inc.
Represented By
Soheyl Tahsildoost
Theta Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Francisco Luis Canales
Represented By
Neal F. Morrow, III
Mfs Legal Inc
contact info
Ryan K. Marden
Marden Law, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Heather Jean Furnas
Represented By
Neal F. Morrow, III
Mfs Legal Inc
contact info
Ryan K. Marden
Marden Law, Inc.
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Thu 05/08 7:56 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Porsche Cars North America, Inc.. (Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 05/02 10:57 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/5/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/12/2025 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 05/02 8:37 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/16/2025. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
3 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Porsche Cars North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Porsche Enterprises Incorporated, Other Affiliate Volkswagen AG, Other Affiliate Porsche Nordamerika Holding GmbH, Other Affiliate PPF Holding AG, Other Affiliate Porsche Holding Stuttgart GmbH, Other Affiliate Dr. Ing. h.c. F. Porsche AG for Porsche Cars North America, Inc.. (Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
Related: [-]
2 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Porsche Cars North America, Inc. . (Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marin County Superior Court. Their case number is CV0005502. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-20631758). Filed by Porsche Cars North America, Inc..(Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Lease Agreement