Original Case: 1:24-cv-01664

Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-01176
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 01, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 03, 2025 2:16 AM MDT
Defendant
THE CITY OF CRAIG COLORADO
Represented By
Eric Michael Ziporin
SGR
contact info
Jonathan Neal Eddy
SGR
contact info
Defendant
KC HUME
Defendant
DALTON CAUDELL
Represented By
Eric Michael Ziporin
SGR
contact info
Jonathan Neal Eddy
SGR
contact info
Defendant
TRACEY MENDOZA
Represented By
Eric Michael Ziporin
SGR
contact info
Jonathan Neal Eddy
SGR
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
CHIP MCINTYRE
Represented By
David M. Goddard
Bruno, Colin, Goddard & Lowe
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
KURTIS LUSTER
Represented By
David M. Goddard
Bruno, Colin, Goddard & Lowe
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
NATE BUSINGER
Represented By
David M. Goddard
Bruno, Colin, Goddard & Lowe
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
BRANDON MONTOYA
Represented By
David M. Goddard
Bruno, Colin, Goddard & Lowe
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
MATT HAMMER
Represented By
David M. Goddard
Bruno, Colin, Goddard & Lowe
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
TANNER SHOLES
Represented By
Conor M. O'Donnell
Kishinevsky & Raykin
contact info
Igor Raykin
Kishinevsky & Raykin
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/03/2025 2:16 AM MDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
[11178413] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/01/2025 Docketing statement due 05/15/2025 for Nate Businger, Matt Hammer, Kurtis Luster, Chip McIntyre and Brandon Montoya. Transcript order form due 05/15/2025 for Nate Businger, Matt Hammer, Kurtis Luster, Chip McIntyre and Brandon Montoya. Notice of appearance due on 05/15/2025 for Nate Businger, Matt Hammer, Kurtis Luster, Chip McIntyre, Brandon Montoya and Tanner Sholes. 25-1176
Related: [-]
Att: 1 34 pgs Main Document
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil