California Northern District Court
Case #: 5:23-cr-00353
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2023
Last checked: Sunday May 04, 2025 1:29 AM PDT
Defendant
Alexandru Brinzan (2)
Represented By
Dejan Gantar
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Taylor Lord
Doj-Usao
contact info
Jared Buszin
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Northern District Of California
contact info

GPO Sep 09 2024
DETENTION ORDER as to Alexandru Brinzan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 9/9/24. (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2024)

Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 2:05 AM PDT

Create an account to get the full docket for this case.