Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 4:25-mj-00210
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2025
Terminated:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Sunday May 04, 2025 2:20 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Carrie Wirsing
Us Attorneys Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Olvin Lara-Lario (1)
Terminated: 04/30/2025
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - Houston
contact info
Houston Interpreter
contact info
Philip G Gallagher
Federal Public Defender
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 3:39 AM CDT
Friday, April 04, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Olvin Lara-Lairo (1), filed. (abb4)
Related: [-]