Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Eduardo V Rodriguez
Case #: 4:25-bk-32473
Case Filed:May 04, 2025

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
J. L. Watts Company
525 17th ST
Rock Island, IL 61201
Represented By
Michael L Weems
Hugheswattersaskanase
contact info
Last checked: Friday May 16, 2025 2:26 PM CDT
Creditor
City of Houston
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP Jeannie Lee Andresen PO Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
Jeannie Lee Andresen
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Houston Community College System
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o Jeannie Lee Andresen PO Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
Jeannie Lee Andresen
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Houston ISD
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o Jeannie Lee Andresen PO Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
Jeannie Lee Andresen
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP
contact info
Creditor
HARRIS COUNTY ATTN PROPERTY TAX DIVISION
HARRIS COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE PO BOX 2848
HOUSTON, TX 77252
Represented By
Susan R. Fuertes
Harris County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Creditor
MDCC Partners LLC
Represented By
Amanda L Cottrell
Sheppard Mullin Richter Hampton LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Christopher Ross Travis
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago
Saturday, May 24, 2025
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/24 11:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/24/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27 Order Dismissing Debtor(s)
Friday, May 23, 2025
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/23 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Order Setting Hearing
Thursday, May 22, 2025
27 27 order Dismissing Debtor(s) Thu 05/22 11:00 AM
Order of Dismissal with Prejudice for a Period of 365 Days. Barred Debtor J. L. Watts Company starting 5/22/2025 to 5/22/2026 Signed on 5/22/2025 Related [+] (njc7)Modified on 5/22/2025 (njc7)
Related: [-] 21 Emergency Motion
court Courtroom Minutes (Text) Thu 05/22 10:54 AM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 10:30 a.m.. Appearances: Michael Weems for the Debtor; James L. Watts present; Benjamin Gilbert for MDCC Partners, LLC. Minutes: Arguments by Mr. Weems and Mr. Gilbert heard. Motion to Refinance at21 withdrawn by Mr. Weems. Case dismissed with prejudice for 365 days. Proposed Order drafted by the Court, shown to the parties and issued by the Court. Related [+] (njc7)
Related: [-] 14 Motion for Approval,21 Emergency Motion
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 05/21 11:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/21/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Order Setting Hearing
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 05/21 11:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/21/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22 Order Setting Hearing
24 24 order Setting Hearing Wed 05/21 2:49 PM
Order for Electronic Chapter 11 Status Conference. Signed on 5/21/2025 Related [+] Status conference to be held on 6/23/2025 at 09:30 AM via telephone and video conference. (njc7)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Monday, May 19, 2025
23 23 order Setting Hearing Mon 05/19 1:29 PM
Order Re-Setting Hearings Signed on 5/19/2025 Related [+] Hearings re-scheduled for 5/22/2025 at 10:30 AM at Houston, Courtroom 8B. (njc7)
Related: [-] 14 Motion for Approval,21 Emergency Motion
22 22 order Setting Hearing Mon 05/19 9:08 AM
Order Setting Hearing Signed on 5/19/2025 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 5/21/2025 at 04:00 PM at Houston, Courtroom 8B. (njc7)
Related: [-] 21 Debtor's Emergency Motion to Dismiss
Friday, May 16, 2025
21 21 4 pgs motion Emergency Motion Fri 05/16 1:12 PM
Emergency Motion by Debtor to Dismiss Case Filed by Debtor J. L. Watts Company (Weems, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Complaint A - Unsworn Declaration
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 05/14 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/14/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Order on Motion for Expedited Consideration
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 05/14 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/14/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order Setting Hearing
Monday, May 12, 2025
18 18 order Expedited Consideration Mon 05/12 1:25 PM
Order Striking Motion For Expedited Consideration Related [+] Signed on 5/12/2025. (njc7)
Related: [-] 15
17 17 order Setting Hearing Mon 05/12 1:23 PM
Order Setting Hearing Signed on 5/12/2025 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 5/21/2025 at 04:00 PM at Houston, Courtroom 8B. (njc7)
Related: [-] 14 Motion for Approval
Friday, May 09, 2025
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/09 11:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/09/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Application to Employ
15 15 3 pgs motion Expedited Consideration Fri 05/09 9:36 AM
Motion for Expedited Consideration Related [+]. Filed by Debtor J. L. Watts Company (Weems, Michael)
Related: [-] 14 Motion for Approval
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Exhibit
14 14 5 pgs motion Approval Fri 05/09 9:33 AM
Motion for Approval TO REFINANCE . Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Debtor J. L. Watts Company (Weems, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Exhibit
Att: 3 Exhibit
Thursday, May 08, 2025
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/08 11:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/08/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order Setting Hearing
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 05/08 2:20 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Susan R. Fuertes Filed by on behalf of HARRIS COUNTY ATTN PROPERTY TAX DIVISION (Fuertes, Susan)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Certificate Thu 05/08 11:44 AM
Certificate of Service (Filed By MDCC Partners LLC ) Related [+] (Cottrell, Amanda)
Related: [-] 9 Order Setting Hearing
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
10 10 1 pgs order Order to Employ Wed 05/07 12:00 PM
Order Granting Debtor's Ex Parte Application to Employ Counsel. Related [+] Signed on 5/7/2025. (njc7)
Related: [-] 6
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
9 9 order Setting Hearing Tue 05/06 9:30 AM
Order Setting Hearing Signed on 5/6/2025 Related [+] Electronic Hearing scheduled for 5/29/2025 at 02:00 PM via telephone and video conference. (njc7)
Related: [-] 7 Emergency Motion
crditcrd none Tue 05/06 9:34 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-32473 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A26130211. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
trustee Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 05/06 2:46 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Christopher Ross Travis (Travis, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
8 8 answer Response Mon 05/05 7:16 PM
Opposition Response to MDCC's Emergency Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay Related [+]. Filed by J. L. Watts Company (Weems, Michael)
Related: [-] 7 Emergency Motion
Att: 1 1 pgs Proposed Order
7 7 12 pgs motion Emergency Motion Mon 05/05 5:29 PM
Emergency Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay Filed by Creditor MDCC Partners LLC (Cottrell, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Secured Lender MDCC Emergency Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay
Att: 2 Affidavit Martin Declaration ISO of Stay Relief Motion
Att: 3 Affidavit Riley Declaration ISO Stay Relief Motion
Att: 4 Affidavit Ron Declaration ISO Stay Relief Motion
6 6 4 pgs motion Employ Mon 05/05 5:00 PM
Application to Employ Michael Weems of Firm Hughes Watters & Askanase LLP as Debtor's Counsel. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Debtor J. L. Watts Company (Weems, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Affidavit
Att: 2 Proposed Order
5 5 court No Creditor Mailing List Mon 05/05 4:12 PM
No Creditor Mailing List (cak4)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 05/05 10:08 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jeannie Lee Andresen Filed by on behalf of Houston ISD, Houston Community College System, City of Houston (Andresen, Jeannie)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 04, 2025
3 3 notice Notice Sun 05/04 5:07 PM
Notice of Corporate Resolution . Filed by J. L. Watts Company (Weems, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit Corporate Resolution
2 2 4 pgs misc Status Report Sun 05/04 4:44 PM
Status Report (Filed By J. L. Watts Company ). (Weems, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Property List
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Loan Term Sheet
1 1 4 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event] Sun 05/04 4:41 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by J. L. Watts Company. (Weems, Michael)
Related: [-]