Original Case: 3:13-cv-01211

Sixth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:14-cv-06525
Typecivil / private / civil rights
Nature of Suit441 Civil Rights - Voting
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2014
Terminated:Oct 13, 2015
Last checked: Saturday Jan 09, 2016 2:35 AM CST
Defendant - Appellee
CHIP FORRESTER
Represented By
James Gerard Stranch IV
Branstetter, Stranch & Jennings
contact info
Benjamin Andrew Gastel
Branstetter, Stranch & Jennings
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
THE TENNESSEE DEMOCRATIC STATE PRIMARY BOARD, et al.
Represented By
James Gerard Stranch IV
Branstetter, Stranch & Jennings
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARK CLAYTON
Represented By
Mark Clayton
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/09/2016 2:35 AM CST
Friday, December 19, 2014
The case manager for this case is: Robin Baker (RB)
Related: [-]
Civil Case Docketed (Voting). Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Mark Clayton. Transcript needed: n. (RB)
Related: [-]