Kentucky Western District Court
Case #: 1:25-cr-00008
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 3:34 AM EDT
Defendant
Kelly Vibbert (1)
Represented By
Aaron M. Dyke
Western Kentucky Federal Community Defender, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Mark J. Yurchisin (USA), II
U.S. Attorney Office - Bowling Green
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 3:49 AM EDT
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
1 1 INDICTMENT as to Seal 1 (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3. (KDY)
Related: [-]
2 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (KDY)
Related: [-]
3 3 SEALED UNREDACTED INDICTMENT re1 Indictment by USA. (KDY)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Mark J. Yurchisin (USA), II appearing for USA. (KDY)
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Seal 1. (KDY)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 2/12/2025 granting5 Motion to Seal Case as to Seal 1 (1). (KDY)
Related: [-]
7 7 Sealed Document . (KDY)
Related: [-]