New York Southern District Court
Case #: 1:25-cv-03595
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 1:07 AM EDT
Defendant
Richard Chipman
Defendant
Coast to Coast Staffing LLC
Defendant
Madison Resources Funding LLC
Defendant
Nesc Staffing Corp.
Defendant
Nesc Staffing LLC
Defendant
Others
Defendant
Partners Personnel Management Services
Defendant
Staffinvest Holding LLC
Defendant
Leonard Tierney
Plaintiff
Tracy Lynn Schneider-Kidan
701 South Olive Ave 1909
West Palm Beach, FL 33401


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
5 5 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 05/05 11:42 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Document filed by Tracy Lynn Schneider-Kidan. (vfr)
Related: [-]
service Note Regarding Service on Self-Represented Party Fri 05/02 12:23 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT NOTE: For each electronic filing made in a case involving a self-represented party who has not consented to electronic service, the filing party must serve the document on such self-represented party in a manner permitted by Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2) (other than through the ECF system) and file proof of service for each document so served. Please see[LINK:Rule 9.2] of the courts ECF Rules & Instructions for further information.(caf)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
4 4 order Standing Order re Cases Filed By Pro Se Plaintiffs Fri 05/02 12:23 PM
STANDING ORDER IN RE CASES FILED BY PRO SE PLAINTIFFS (See 24-MISC-127 Standing Order filed March 18, 2024). To ensure that all cases heard in the Southern District of New York are handled promptly and efficiently, all parties must keep the court apprised of any new contact information. It is a party's obligation to provide an address for service; service of court orders cannot be accomplished if a party does not update the court when a change of address occurs. Accordingly, all self-represented litigants are hereby ORDERED to inform the court of each change in their address or electronic contact information. Parties may[LINK:consent to electronic service] to receive notifications of court filings by email, rather than relying on regular mail delivery. Parties may also ask the court for[LINK:permission to file documents electronically] . Forms, including instructions for consenting to electronic service and requesting permission to file documents electronically, may be found by clicking on the hyperlinks in this order, or by accessing the forms on the courts website, nysd.uscourts.gov/forms. The procedures that follow apply only to cases filed by pro se plaintiffs. If the court receives notice from the United States Postal Service that an order has been returned to the court, or otherwise receives information that the address of record for a self-represented plaintiff is no longer valid, the court may issue an Order to Show Cause why the case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with this order. Such order will be sent to the plaintiffs last known address and will also be viewable on the court's electronic docket. A notice directing the parties' attention to this order shall be docketed (and mailed to any self-represented party that has appeared and has not consented to electronic service) upon the opening of each case or miscellaneous matter that is classified as pro se in the court's records. (Signed by Chief Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/18/2024) (caf)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Pro Se Consent to Receive Electronic Service Fri 05/02 12:20 PM
PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Tracy L Schneider-Kidan consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Tracy Lynn Schneider-Kidan.(caf)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Court to Request Counsel Fri 05/02 12:16 PM
APPLICATION for the Court to Request Counsel. Document filed by Tracy Lynn Schneider-Kidan.(caf)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/02 12:14 PM
COMPLAINT against Richard Chipman, Coast to Coast Staffing LLC, Madison Resources Funding LLC, Nesc Staffing Corp., Nesc Staffing LLC, Others, Partners Personnel Management Services, Staffinvest Holding LLC, Leonard Tierney. Document filed by Tracy Lynn Schneider-Kidan.(caf) (caf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (5/2/2025) Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 (5/2/2025) Exhibit 2
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 05/02 12:17 PM
Case Designated ECF. (caf)
Related: [-]