New York Southern District Court
Judge:Andrew L Carter, Jr
Case #: 1:25-cv-03713
Nature of Suit150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause28:1332oc Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:May 02, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 3:39 AM EDT
All Defendants
AdvEn, Inc
All Plaintiffs
Plaintiff GPL Ventures LLC
Represented By
Stanley Charles Morris
Corrigan & Morris LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued Wed 05/07 2:06 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AdvEn, Inc..(pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
7 7 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 05/06 10:58 AM
AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by GPL Ventures LLC..(Morris, Stanley)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 05/06 10:54 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ADVEN, INC., f/k/a NANO INNOVATIONS, INC., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by GPL Ventures LLC..(Morris, Stanley)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 05/05 11:21 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Stanley Charles Morris to RE-FILE Document No. 5 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the jurisdiction of this action is based on diversity - the party/intervenor did not name and identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes or No radio button - If Yes - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time - name and identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Please use the revised form found here NYSD form page (lb)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Mon 05/05 1:56 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Stanley Charles Morris. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: GPL Ventures LLC; AdvEn, Inc. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; alias party name was omitted. (sj)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 05/05 2:02 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Stanley Charles Morris. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 150 (Contract: Recovery/Enforcement); Dollar Demand $900,000,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 190 (Contract: Other); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $900,000. (sj)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 05/05 2:07 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 05/05 2:09 PM
Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 05/05 2:09 PM
Case Designated ECF. (sj)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 05/05 2:12 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Stanley Charles Morris to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Filing Court is not indicated on PDF, use drop down box to choose. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 03, 2025
5 5 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Sat 05/03 12:25 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by GPL Ventures LLC..(Morris, Stanley)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Sat 05/03 12:23 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stanley Charles Morris on behalf of GPL Ventures LLC..(Morris, Stanley)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Sat 05/03 12:21 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ADVEN, INC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by GPL Ventures LLC..(Morris, Stanley)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Sat 05/03 12:18 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Morris, Stanley)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/02 11:43 PM
COMPLAINT against AdvEn, Inc. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-31026567)Document filed by GPL Ventures LLC..(Morris, Stanley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 SPA,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Note,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 Warrant