Arkansas Western District Court
Case #: 1:25-cm-00002
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2025
Terminated:Feb 04, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 2:14 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Tyler Williams
Doj-Usao
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Search Warrant (1)
Terminated: 02/04/2025


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 2:41 AM CDT
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
1 1 APPLICATION/AFFIDAVIT for Search Warrant by USA. (mbm)
Related: [-]
2 2 Search and Seizure Warrant Issued. Search Warrant Return Deadline set for 3/6/2025. (mbm)
Related: [-]
3 3 THE DOCUMENT IS FILED UNDER SEAL WITH THE COURT. APPLICATION FOR ORDER COMMANDING MEDIALAB, INC., NOT TO NOTIFY ANY PERSON OF THE EXISTENCE OF LEGAL PROCESS by USA as to Search Warrant. (mbm)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER THIS DOCUMENT IS FILED UNDER SEAL. granting3 Application for Order Not to Notify as to Search Warrant (1). Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on February 4, 2025. (mbm)
Related: [-]