Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 0:25-mj-06076
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2025
Terminated:Feb 13, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 3:19 AM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joseph A. Cooley
Doj-Usao
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Dante Eliseo Lopez (1)
Terminated: 02/13/2025
Represented By
David J. Sobel
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 3:52 AM EDT

Create an account to get the full docket for this case.