Kansas District Court
Case #: 6:25-mj-06021
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2025
Terminated:Feb 13, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 2:14 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Debra L. Barnett
Office Of United States Attorney - Wichita
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Cellular Telephone (1)
Terminated: 02/13/2025


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 2:41 AM CDT
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
1 1 APPLICATION FOR SEARCH WARRANT as to Cellular Telephone by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. (Attachment: #1 Affidavit in Support of Search Warrant) (msb)
Related: [-]
2 2 SEARCH & SEIZURE WARRANT ISSUED as to Cellular Telephone. (msb)
Related: [-]