Kentucky Western District Court
Case #: 3:25-cr-00013
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 3:36 AM EDT
Defendant
Dayshawn Crumes (1)
Represented By
Patrick J. Bouldin
Western Kentucky Federal Community Defender, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Erwin Roberts (USA)
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Louisville
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 3:52 AM EDT
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
1 1 INDICTMENT as to Seal 1 (1): count(s) 1. (SMJ)
Related: [-]
2 2 SEALED DOCUMENT: Unredacted Indictment re1 Indictment. (SMJ)
Related: [-]
3 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SMJ)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Erwin Roberts appearing for USA. (SMJ)
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Seal 1. (SMJ)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 2/4/2025 granting5 Motion to Seal Case as to Seal 1 (1). (SMJ)
Related: [-]
7 7 Sealed Document (SMJ)
Related: [-]