Minnesota District Court
Case #: 0:25-cr-00027
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2025
Terminated:May 01, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 2:17 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kristian C.S. Weir
Doj-Usao
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Sotero Ortiz-Sanchez (1)
Terminated: 05/01/2025
Represented By
Katherian D Roe
Office Of The Federal Defender
contact info
Kevin M O'Brien
Kevin O'Brien
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 2:45 AM CDT
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
1 1 INDICTMENT (Unsealed 2/10/25) assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois by USA Kristian Weir as to Sotero Ortiz-Sanchez (1) count 1. (LTT) Document QC'd on 2/5/2025 (ABR). Modified text on 2/11/2025 (ALN).
Related: [-]
2 2 Defendant Information Sheet as to Sotero Ortiz-Sanchez. (LTT) Document QC'd on 2/5/2025 (ABR).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Original Signature Page
3 3 Bench Warrant Issued as to Sotero Ortiz-Sanchez by Judge David S. Doty. (LTT)
Related: [-]
4 4 Oral Motion to Seal pursuant to LR 49.1 the Indictment be sealed and remain sealed until the defendants have had their first appearance, by USA as to Sotero Ortiz-Sanchez. (LTT)
Related: [-]
5 5 Oral Order granting Motion to Seal pursuant to Rule 49.1(d) of the Local Rules for the District of Minnesota, the indictments proposed to be filed under seal be so filed and remain sealed until the defendant make his/her initial appearance before the court as to Sotero Ortiz-Sanchez (1), by Judge David S. Doty on 2/4/25. (LTT) Modified text on 2/5/2025 (LTT).
Related: [-]